California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 11, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill May 20, 2019
Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019