|
09/26/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3415.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2751.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2014.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
(pending re-referral to Com. on H. & C.D.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|