California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019