|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3289.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2708.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 13. Page 1075.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|