California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill September 5, 2019
Bill June 19, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019
Bill February 15, 2019