|
09/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2898.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2289.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1257.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|