California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 15, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019