California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019