|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 828, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3036.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 2025.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|