California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 22, 2019
Bill August 19, 2019
Bill July 9, 2019
Bill May 20, 2019