Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 2095.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|