California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019