|
09/11/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5321.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3896.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|