California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2020

Amended

Bill August 1, 2020
Bill June 17, 2020
Bill January 15, 2020
Bill January 6, 2020
Bill March 26, 2019