Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|