Senate
|
07/09/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 6. Page 2043.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1778.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|