California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill July 9, 2020
Bill June 26, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019