|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2899.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2280.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2013.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|