California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill August 19, 2019
Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019