|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
(Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 3033.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Bill in its final form passes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Vote on concurrence in final form pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2447.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 2152.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2149.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2064.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1828.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|