California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2019

Amended

Bill May 29, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019