|
08/17/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 5063.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 3748.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|