California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2020

Amended

Bill February 11, 2020
Bill August 12, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019