Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/23/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|