California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill July 23, 2020
Bill June 29, 2020
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019