|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2721.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2137.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|