California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2019

Amended

Bill June 18, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019