California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1554 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/16/2019

                    Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1554Introduced by Assembly Member GonzalezFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 2810.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1554, Gonzalez. Employers: dependent care assistance program: notice to employees.Existing law relating to the obligations of an employer requires an employer to notify employees of prescribed information relating to employment and benefits.This bill would require an employer to notify, in a prescribed manner, an employee who participates in a flexible spending account of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 2810.7 is added to the Labor Code, to read:2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1554Introduced by Assembly Member GonzalezFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 2810.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1554, Gonzalez. Employers: dependent care assistance program: notice to employees.Existing law relating to the obligations of an employer requires an employer to notify employees of prescribed information relating to employment and benefits.This bill would require an employer to notify, in a prescribed manner, an employee who participates in a flexible spending account of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019 Amended IN  Senate  June 18, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019

Enrolled  August 16, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  August 12, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  August 15, 2019
Amended IN  Senate  June 18, 2019
Amended IN  Assembly  April 08, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1554

Introduced by Assembly Member GonzalezFebruary 22, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Gonzalez
February 22, 2019

 An act to add Section 2810.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1554, Gonzalez. Employers: dependent care assistance program: notice to employees.

Existing law relating to the obligations of an employer requires an employer to notify employees of prescribed information relating to employment and benefits.This bill would require an employer to notify, in a prescribed manner, an employee who participates in a flexible spending account of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year.

Existing law relating to the obligations of an employer requires an employer to notify employees of prescribed information relating to employment and benefits.

This bill would require an employer to notify, in a prescribed manner, an employee who participates in a flexible spending account of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 2810.7 is added to the Labor Code, to read:2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 2810.7 is added to the Labor Code, to read:2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.

SECTION 1. Section 2810.7 is added to the Labor Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.

2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.

2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:(1) Electronic mail communication.(2) Telephone communication.(3) Text message notification.(4) Postal mail notification.(5) In-person notification.



2810.7. (a) An employer shall notify an employee who participates in a flexible spending account, including, but not limited to, a dependent care flexible spending account, a health flexible spending account, or adoption assistance flexible spending account, of any deadline to withdraw funds before the end of the plan year. Notice shall be by two different forms, one of which may be electronic.

(b) Notices made pursuant to subdivision (a) may include, but are not limited to the following:

(1) Electronic mail communication.

(2) Telephone communication.

(3) Text message notification.

(4) Postal mail notification.

(5) In-person notification.