Senate | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1516.) | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 28. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |