|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 543, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3424.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2762.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|