California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill May 6, 2019