|
09/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2900.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2272.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1578.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|