|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2715.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1260.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|