|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3272.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2709.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1572.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|