California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 5, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 24, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019