Senate | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1911.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |