|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 5472.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 1512.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|