California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1788 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill August 28, 2020
Bill August 20, 2020
Bill July 30, 2020
Bill June 24, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019