|
09/20/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3030.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2459.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 1912.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|