California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2019

Amended

Bill August 27, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019