|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3471.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2269.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1523.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|