California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1820 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 15, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill May 24, 2019