|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5424.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4696.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|