California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1906 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 20, 2020
Bill March 5, 2020