|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4292.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 4851.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|