California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1950 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2020

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2020

Amended

Bill June 10, 2020
Bill May 21, 2020
Bill May 6, 2020