Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2020 | Read first time. To print. |