09/28/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2020. | |||
09/28/2020 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/04/2020 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4372.). | ||
Senate | 07/31/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/30/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Read first time. To print. |