California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2107 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 2107 CHAPTER 213 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. [ Approved by Governor September 28, 2020. Filed with Secretary of State September 28, 2020. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
1+Enrolled August 31, 2020 Passed IN Senate August 28, 2020 Passed IN Assembly May 26, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2107Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 2107 CHAPTER 213 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. [ Approved by Governor September 28, 2020. Filed with Secretary of State September 28, 2020. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled August 31, 2020 Passed IN Senate August 28, 2020 Passed IN Assembly May 26, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2107Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 2107 CHAPTER 213
5+ Enrolled August 31, 2020 Passed IN Senate August 28, 2020 Passed IN Assembly May 26, 2020
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 2107
7+Enrolled August 31, 2020
8+Passed IN Senate August 28, 2020
9+Passed IN Assembly May 26, 2020
810
9- CHAPTER 213
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Assembly Bill
14+
15+No. 2107
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and GrayFebruary 06, 2020
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Members Rodriguez and Gray
20+February 06, 2020
1021
1122 An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor September 28, 2020. Filed with Secretary of State September 28, 2020. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 AB 2107, Rodriguez. Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.
2029
2130 Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.
2231
2332 Existing law, until December 31, 2019, authorizes a special district to issue, as specified, securitized limited obligation notes for the acquisition or improvement of land, facilities, or equipment.
2433
2534 This bill would extend that authorization to December 31, 2024.
2635
2736 ## Digest Key
2837
2938 ## Bill Text
3039
3140 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
3241
3342 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3443
3544 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3645
3746 SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
3847
3948 SECTION 1. Section 53839 of the Government Code is amended to read:
4049
4150 ### SECTION 1.
4251
4352 53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
4453
4554 53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
4655
4756 53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.
4857
4958
5059
5160 53839. A special district shall not issue any securitized limited obligation notes after December 31, 2024, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before December 31, 2024, deletes or extends that date.