Senate | 08/30/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 8. Page 1790.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2019 | Read first time. To print. |